Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/03/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/17/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/30/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/30/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/17/2004