Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/08/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 12/08/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 12/08/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 01/21/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/21/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/21/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/21/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/21/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/25/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/25/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/25/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/16/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/30/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/30/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/10/2004