Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/21/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/28/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/30/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/10/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/17/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/19/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/21/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/21/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/10/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/26/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/26/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/26/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/26/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/10/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/11/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/18/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/30/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/31/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/26/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/04/2004