Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/16/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/21/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/04/2003