Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/14/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/14/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/14/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/19/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/19/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/22/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/22/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/03/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/03/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/03/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/03/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/03/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/10/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/10/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/12/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/17/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/17/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/17/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/17/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/23/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/23/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/23/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/23/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/23/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/23/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/26/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/03/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/03/2003