Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/01/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/07/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/09/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/09/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/09/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/16/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/23/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/26/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 07/08/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/14/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/17/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/24/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/24/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/04/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/09/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/09/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/09/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/16/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/16/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/23/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/23/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/30/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/12/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/12/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 11/12/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/12/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/20/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/24/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/26/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/27/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/11/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/13/2004