Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/04/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/13/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/19/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/09/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/12/2004