Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 04/09/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/10/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/11/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/07/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/11/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/24/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/23/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/30/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 06/14/2004