Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/27/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/27/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/27/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/27/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/27/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 01/27/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/27/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 01/27/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/27/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 01/27/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/27/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/31/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 01/31/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/04/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/04/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/04/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/04/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/05/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/05/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/11/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/11/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/11/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/04/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/04/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/06/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/06/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/06/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/10/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/10/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/10/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/10/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/10/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/10/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/10/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 03/10/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/10/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/10/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/10/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/10/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/10/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/13/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/17/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/17/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/17/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/19/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/24/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 03/24/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/24/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/24/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/27/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/27/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/27/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/07/2003
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/07/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/07/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/29/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/30/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/05/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/07/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/09/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/09/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 05/09/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/14/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/14/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/14/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/14/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/14/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/14/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/15/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/15/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/15/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/15/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/19/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/19/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/19/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/21/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/21/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/21/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/21/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/02/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/02/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/02/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/02/2003