Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/20/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/20/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/18/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/21/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/21/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/21/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/21/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/21/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/28/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/28/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/28/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/28/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/28/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/28/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/28/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/12/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/12/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/12/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/12/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/12/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/12/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/17/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/07/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/07/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/29/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/29/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/17/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/17/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/17/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/17/2004