Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/13/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/27/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/19/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/19/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/01/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/06/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/11/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/02/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/07/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/30/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/20/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/06/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/20/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/09/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/21/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/08/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/07/2004