Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/21/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/21/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/22/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/22/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 09/23/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/28/2004