Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/18/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/20/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/20/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/20/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/27/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/27/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/31/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 03/31/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 04/03/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/07/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/07/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/07/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/07/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/07/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/07/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/07/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/10/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/10/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/01/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/13/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/15/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/05/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/12/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/12/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/17/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/26/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/14/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/14/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/14/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/17/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/17/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/21/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/10/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/01/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/07/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/08/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/10/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/04/2004