Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/03/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/15/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/07/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/08/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/08/2004