Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/11/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/11/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/11/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/11/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/11/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/11/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/11/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/11/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/11/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/25/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/25/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/25/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 02/25/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/25/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/03/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/03/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/03/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/03/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/03/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/10/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/10/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/29/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/29/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/29/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/30/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/30/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/30/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/31/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/31/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/31/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/31/2004