Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/23/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/24/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/24/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/25/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/02/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/10/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/24/2004