Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/09/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/14/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/14/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/14/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/14/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/14/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/14/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/14/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/14/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/14/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/14/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/14/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/14/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/14/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/14/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/14/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/14/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/14/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/16/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/17/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/17/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/17/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/17/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/17/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/06/2003