Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 01/29/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/04/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/04/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/04/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/11/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/11/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/12/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/13/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/06/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/11/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/25/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/25/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/03/2003