Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/23/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 06/23/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/23/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/23/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/20/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/20/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/21/2004