Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/22/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 05/22/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/22/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/10/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/10/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/10/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/10/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/10/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/24/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/24/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/24/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/15/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/15/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/15/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/15/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/15/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/15/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/15/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/07/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/07/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/07/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/25/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/25/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/25/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/25/2003