Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/18/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/18/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/31/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/31/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/31/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/31/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/07/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/07/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 04/07/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/07/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/07/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/09/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/09/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/09/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/30/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/30/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/09/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/22/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/22/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/22/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/04/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/04/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/04/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/04/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/25/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/25/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/25/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/26/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/14/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/11/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/23/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/24/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/07/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/16/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/11/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/11/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/11/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/11/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/11/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/17/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/17/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/07/2004