Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/05/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/05/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/26/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/26/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/26/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/18/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/18/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/18/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/18/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/27/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/27/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/07/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/07/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/07/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/07/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/07/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/07/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/07/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/07/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/07/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/07/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 06/03/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/03/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/25/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/25/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/09/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/09/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/09/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/18/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/18/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/25/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/05/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/05/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/05/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/05/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/05/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/05/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/24/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 11/06/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/06/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/10/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/10/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/10/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/10/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/17/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/24/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/24/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/24/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/22/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/22/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 05/04/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/04/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/18/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/08/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/08/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/08/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/14/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/30/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/05/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/20/2004