Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/05/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/05/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/20/2004