Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/27/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/27/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/27/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/13/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/13/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/27/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/27/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/27/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/03/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/01/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/01/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/01/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/09/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/09/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/05/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/05/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/12/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/12/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/12/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/10/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/10/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/18/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/05/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/05/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/05/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/11/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/25/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/01/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/04/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/21/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/21/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/11/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/11/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/25/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/25/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/04/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/11/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/18/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/27/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/05/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/05/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/03/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/15/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/16/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/22/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/20/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/14/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/14/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/23/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/23/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/18/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/06/2004