Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/30/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/30/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/20/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/20/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/20/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/20/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 06/05/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/12/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/12/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/18/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/18/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/18/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/18/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/18/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/18/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/24/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/24/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/23/2003