Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/25/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/24/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/20/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/12/2004