Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/26/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/26/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/26/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/04/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/04/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/13/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/21/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/21/2004