Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/12/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/12/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/13/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/20/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/02/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/07/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/10/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/24/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/25/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/07/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/20/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/17/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/04/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/23/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/07/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/07/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/22/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/30/2004