Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/13/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/20/2003
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/07/2004