Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/11/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/11/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/25/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/25/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/06/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/06/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/06/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/11/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/11/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 03/11/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/12/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/12/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/20/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/25/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/25/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/27/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/01/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/01/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/08/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/30/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/30/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/30/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/30/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/30/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/30/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 05/06/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/14/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/21/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/22/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/22/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/22/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/22/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/03/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/03/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/04/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/04/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/04/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 06/09/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/09/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/10/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/12/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/16/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/16/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/16/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/16/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew