Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/11/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/11/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/25/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/18/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/18/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/19/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/26/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/26/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/01/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/07/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/08/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/06/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/04/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/11/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 07/22/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/04/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/28/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/03/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/04/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/04/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/04/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/18/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/22/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/02/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/16/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/21/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/23/2004