Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/09/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/13/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/15/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/15/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/15/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/15/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/15/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/17/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/17/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/21/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/21/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/21/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/21/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/21/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/21/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/21/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/21/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/21/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/21/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/22/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/22/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/22/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/22/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/22/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/23/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/23/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/23/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/23/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/23/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/23/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/23/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/23/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/23/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/23/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/23/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/23/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/23/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/29/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/29/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/29/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/29/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/29/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/29/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/30/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/04/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/04/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/04/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/04/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/05/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/05/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/05/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/06/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/06/2004