Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/05/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/11/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/11/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 02/11/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/11/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/11/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/11/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/11/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 02/13/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 02/13/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/25/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/25/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/25/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/25/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/25/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/25/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/25/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/25/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/26/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/26/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/26/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/26/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/26/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/04/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/04/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/06/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/11/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 03/11/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/11/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/11/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/11/2003