Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/29/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/05/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/05/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/05/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/11/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 02/11/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/11/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/11/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/11/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/12/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/12/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/12/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/12/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/12/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/13/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/25/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/25/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/25/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/04/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/04/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/11/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/01/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/01/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/30/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/30/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/18/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/10/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/14/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/21/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/09/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/29/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/29/2004