Refine your search

Date Major Actions
12/08/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-447.
12/08/2004 Signed by President.
12/07/2004 Presented to President.
11/20/2004 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 65 - 30. Record Vote Number: 215.(consideration: CR S11740-11767)
11/20/2004 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 344 - 51, 1 Present (Roll no. 542).
11/20/2004 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
11/20/2004 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 108-792 filed.(text of conference report: CR H10235-10887)
11/17/2004 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
09/23/2004 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees McConnell; Specter; Gregg; Shelby; Bennett; Campbell; Bond; DeWine; Stevens; Leahy; Inouye; Harkin; Mikulski; Durbin; Johnson; Landrieu; Byrd.
09/23/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2812 with an amendment by Voice Vote.(text of measure as passed Senate: CR 9/27/2004 S9734-9756)
09/23/2004 Senate Committee on Appropriations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/15/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 365 - 41 (Roll no. 390).
07/13/2004 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 108-599, by Mr. Kolbe.
07/13/2004 Introduced in House