Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/09/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/15/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/15/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/19/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/19/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/22/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/22/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/08/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/08/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/08/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/21/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/21/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/21/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/21/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/21/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/21/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/21/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/28/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/04/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/04/2004