Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/07/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/08/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/08/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/08/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/08/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/08/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/13/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/13/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/13/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/13/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/13/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/13/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/13/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/13/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/13/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/13/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/13/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/13/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/15/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/15/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/15/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/15/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/22/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/13/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/13/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/13/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/13/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/13/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/22/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/22/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/22/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/28/2004