Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/07/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/07/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/07/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/07/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/08/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 07/08/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/08/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/09/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/09/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/13/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/13/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/13/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/13/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/14/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/15/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/07/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/17/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/07/2004