There is one summary for this bill. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/22/2004)

Terrorism Insurance Backstop Extension Act of 2004 - Amends the Terrorism Risk Insurance Act of 2002 to define: (1) the term "Program Year 4" as the period from January 1, 2006, through December 31, 2006; and (2) the term "Program Year 5" as the period from January 1, 2007, through December 31, 2007 (thereby extending the terrorism risk insurance program from 2005 through 2007).

Sets a deadline for the Secretary of the Treasury to make a final determination regarding: (1) the availability of group life insurance to both insurers and consumers; and (2) whether certain provisions of the Act shall be applied to providers of group life insurance.

Sunsets the Terrorism Risk Insurance Program after December 31, 2007.