Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/22/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/22/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/22/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/22/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/23/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/23/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 06/23/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/23/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/23/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/24/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/24/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/24/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/25/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 06/25/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/25/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/06/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/06/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/06/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/06/2004
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/06/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/06/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/06/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/07/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/07/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/07/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/07/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 07/09/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/12/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/12/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/14/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/14/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/14/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/20/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/20/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/20/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/21/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/21/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/22/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/22/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/22/2004
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/22/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/22/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/22/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/22/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/22/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/22/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/08/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/08/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/08/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/13/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/13/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/14/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/14/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/22/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/22/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/22/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/22/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/23/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/23/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/23/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/28/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/28/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/28/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/04/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew