Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/17/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/24/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/24/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/24/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/24/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/24/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/24/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/24/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/24/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/24/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/24/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/24/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/24/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/24/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/24/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/24/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/24/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/24/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/24/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/06/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/06/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/06/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/06/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/06/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/06/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/08/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/08/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/08/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/12/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/19/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/19/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/07/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/07/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/07/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/07/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/07/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/07/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/13/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/13/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/21/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/22/2004
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/24/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/28/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/28/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/28/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/29/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/04/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/05/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/05/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/07/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/16/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/16/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/16/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/16/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/16/2004