Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/16/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/16/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/17/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/21/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/21/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/21/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/23/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/23/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/23/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/24/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/24/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/06/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/06/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/06/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/06/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/07/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/07/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/09/2004