Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/09/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/16/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/22/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/23/2004
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/24/2004
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 06/25/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/25/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/08/2004