Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/04/2004
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/04/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 06/04/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/04/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/09/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/09/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/09/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/09/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/09/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/14/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/14/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/14/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/14/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/14/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/14/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/14/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/15/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/15/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/16/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/16/2004