Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/02/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/02/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/15/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/15/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/15/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/16/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/16/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/16/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/16/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/16/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/16/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/16/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/16/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/16/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/16/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/16/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/16/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/16/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/16/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/25/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/08/2004