Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 05/20/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/20/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/17/2004
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/17/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/17/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/21/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/21/2004
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/24/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/24/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/09/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/09/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/09/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/13/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/13/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/07/2004