Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/20/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/20/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/01/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/01/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/03/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/03/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/08/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/08/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/14/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/14/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/14/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/14/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/14/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/14/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/14/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/16/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/18/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/18/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/24/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/24/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/24/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/25/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/25/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/25/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/06/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/06/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/06/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/08/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/08/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/08/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/14/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/14/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/14/2004
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/14/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/14/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/14/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/15/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/15/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/15/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/21/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/21/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/21/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/21/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/23/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/23/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/23/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/23/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/23/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/23/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/23/2004
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/28/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/28/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/28/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/28/2004
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/28/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/28/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/28/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/28/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/28/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/30/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/30/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 10/08/2004