Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/18/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/19/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/20/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/20/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/20/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/01/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/01/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/01/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/01/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/01/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/01/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/02/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/02/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/02/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/02/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/02/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/02/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/02/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/03/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/08/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/08/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/08/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/09/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/09/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/09/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/15/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/15/2004