Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/13/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/13/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/13/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/20/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/20/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/01/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/01/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/14/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/14/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/14/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/14/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/14/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/22/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/13/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/13/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/13/2004