Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/13/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/13/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/13/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 05/17/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/17/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/17/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/17/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/17/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/17/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/17/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/17/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/17/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/17/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/18/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/18/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/18/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/18/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/18/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/18/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/18/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/18/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/18/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/18/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/18/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/18/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/18/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/18/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/18/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/18/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/18/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/18/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/18/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/18/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/18/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/18/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/18/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/18/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/18/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/18/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/18/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/18/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/19/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/19/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/19/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/19/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/19/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/19/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/19/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/19/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/19/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/19/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/19/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/19/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/19/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/19/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/19/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/19/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/19/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/20/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/20/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/20/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/20/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/20/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/20/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/20/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/20/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/20/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/20/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/20/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/20/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/20/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/15/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/15/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/15/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/15/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/15/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/15/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/15/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/16/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/17/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/25/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/25/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/25/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/25/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/07/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/22/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/22/2004